USA v. Itta et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2009-cr-00090-17409 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
322
08/29/2018
USPO Request for Modification - 12B
323
08/30/2018
Order
08/30/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.