USA v. Iverson
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00025-59273 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
19
06/14/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
06/14/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
06/19/2018
Plea Agreement
21
06/19/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
06/20/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
08/14/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
25
08/16/2018
Unopposed Motion
08/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/17/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
10/04/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
28
10/05/2018
Unopposed Motion
10/09/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
11/02/2018
Unopposed Motion
32
11/02/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
33
11/02/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
11/05/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
11/05/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
36
11/05/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
11/14/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
11/14/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
40
11/15/2018
Judgment
41
11/15/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
42
12/07/2018
Notice (Other)
43
12/10/2018
Notice (Other)
44
12/12/2018
Amended Judgment
45
12/12/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
46
12/19/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.