USA v. Jackson
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2013-cr-00090-49478 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
177
08/14/2018
Petition for Warrant of Arrest for Offender - 12C
178
08/14/2018
Order on Petition for Warrant for Offender - 12C
08/14/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
181
08/16/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
182
08/16/2018
Order of Detention
183
08/17/2018
Notice (Other)
184
08/23/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
08/31/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
186
09/17/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
09/17/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
188
09/17/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
189
09/17/2018
Order of Release
09/17/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
191
09/17/2018
Order of Release
193
11/05/2018
Order on Petition for Warrant for Offender - 12C
11/05/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
197
11/07/2018
Order of Detention
11/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
201
01/04/2019
Unopposed Motion
01/04/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
203
02/11/2019
Violation Disposition Report
204
02/12/2019
Unopposed Motion
02/12/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
206
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
207
05/10/2019
Continue
05/14/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.