USA v. Jacobsson
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00158 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
31
05/25/2018
Waiver of Trial by Jury
06/13/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/13/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
07/05/2018
Transcript
36
07/12/2018
DEPS Notice
37
07/26/2018
Trial Brief
38
07/27/2018
Unopposed Motion
07/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
07/30/2018
Continue
07/30/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
08/03/2018
Stipulation
45
08/06/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions
46
08/06/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
47
08/22/2018
Unopposed Motion
08/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
10/22/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
10/24/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.