USA v. James et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00099 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
203
05/24/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
06/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
205
06/19/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
206
06/20/2018
DEPS Notice
207
06/25/2018
Transfer Out/Probationer/Supervised Releasee
208
06/25/2018
Letter - Transfer of Matter
209
06/26/2018
Continue
06/26/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
211
06/28/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
212
06/28/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
213
06/28/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
214
06/28/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
07/03/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
217
07/03/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
218
07/03/2018
Judgment
219
07/03/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
07/05/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
223
07/05/2018
Witness List Public Doc
224
07/05/2018
Exhibit List
225
07/24/2018
Judgment
226
07/24/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
07/25/2018
Writ Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
Writ Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
227
07/24/2018
Application for Writ of Execution on Permanent Fund Dividend
228
07/24/2018
Application for Writ of Execution on Permanent Fund Dividend
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.