USA v. Javar
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00046-59842 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
5
06/15/2018
Pretrial Services Report
06/15/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
06/15/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
9
06/15/2018
Order of Detention
10
06/15/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
06/15/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
06/18/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
13
06/19/2018
Notice of Setting Trial By Jury
14
07/02/2018
Substitute Attorney
15
07/02/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
07/06/2018
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
07/31/2018
Continue
18
07/31/2018
Affidavit
08/01/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
09/25/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
09/25/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
10/03/2018
Plea Agreement
23
10/03/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
10/10/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
11/26/2018
Notice (Other)
02/04/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
02/27/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
31
03/20/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
32
03/27/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
03/28/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
03/29/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
35
03/29/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
36
03/29/2019
Leave to File Document
37
03/29/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
38
03/29/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
04/03/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/03/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
04/05/2019
Judgment
43
04/05/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.