USA v. Jayavarman
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2013-cr-00097 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
298
06/05/2018
Sentencing
299
06/11/2018
Amended Judgment
300
06/11/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
301
06/14/2018
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
06/14/2018
USCA Appeal Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
302
06/20/2018
Appeal Transcript (USDCA 435) Request
303
06/20/2018
Designation of Record on Appeal
304
06/20/2018
Subsequent Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
306
06/27/2018
USCA Order
308
07/09/2018
Transcript
309
07/27/2018
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
310
08/29/2018
USCA Order
311
10/11/2018
USCA Order
312
10/17/2018
USCA Order
10/17/2018
USCA Mandate (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.