USA v. Jenkins
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00108 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
56
05/25/2018
In Limine
57
06/01/2018
Response in Opposition
58
06/04/2018
DEPS Notice
06/07/2018
Pretrial Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
06/08/2018
Proposed Jury Instructions
06/08/2018
Order on Motion in Limine (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
Order on Motion in Limine (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
06/08/2018
In Limine
63
06/08/2018
Response in Opposition
64
06/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
65
06/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
66
06/15/2018
Jury Trial
67
06/15/2018
Witness List Public Doc
68
06/15/2018
Exhibit List
69
06/15/2018
Jury Instructions
70
06/15/2018
Jury Verdict
71
06/26/2018
Forfeiture of Property
72
06/26/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
73
06/26/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
09/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
76
10/04/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
77
10/29/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
78
10/30/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
10/31/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
81
11/09/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
82
11/09/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
83
11/09/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
84
11/09/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
85
11/15/2018
Forfeiture of Property
86
11/15/2018
Affidavit
87
11/15/2018
Withdraw as Attorney
11/16/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.