USA v. Jett
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cr-00094 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
81
08/31/2018
Petition for Action - PS8 Request for Modification
10/15/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
88
10/23/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
89
10/23/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
10/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/26/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/26/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
92
10/29/2018
Continue
10/30/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
96
11/05/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
97
11/05/2018
Order of Release
98
11/07/2018
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
99
11/15/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
100
11/16/2018
Transcript
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.