USA v. Jha
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00164-58770 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
19
09/04/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
20
09/11/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
21
09/11/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
22
09/11/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
24
09/19/2018
Order
25
09/20/2018
Transcript - SEALED
26
09/20/2018
Transcript
27
09/26/2018
Sentencing
28
09/26/2018
Witness List Public Doc
30
09/26/2018
Witness List
31
10/04/2018
Judgment
32
10/04/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.