USA v. Jimenez Jr
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00140 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
34
07/02/2018
Continue
07/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
09/04/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
37
09/04/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
38
09/04/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
39
09/04/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
09/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
09/19/2018
Judgment
45
09/19/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.