USA v. Jimenez et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2010-cr-00005 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
147
07/02/2018
Continue
07/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
149
09/04/2018
Violation Disposition Report
09/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
153
09/18/2018
Judgment on Revocation
154
09/18/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.