USA v. Jimenez et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2010-cr-00005-23904 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
160
01/16/2019
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
161
01/16/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release
01/16/2019
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/25/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
163
02/08/2019
Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release
02/12/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/12/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
165
02/22/2019
Unopposed Motion
02/25/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
167
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
168
03/08/2019
Status Report
03/12/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.