USA v. Jobe
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00081-60448 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
4
10/10/2018
Pretrial Services Report
10/10/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
10/10/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
7
10/10/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
8
10/10/2018
Order of Detention
10
10/18/2018
Unopposed Motion
10/18/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
10/31/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
13
11/07/2018
Unopposed Motion
14
11/07/2018
Unopposed Motion
11/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/13/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/13/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
02/15/2019
Unopposed Motion
02/15/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/15/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
25
03/22/2019
Hearing
26
03/25/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
03/25/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/25/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
03/26/2019
Declaration
03/27/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
04/01/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
32
05/09/2019
Continue
05/09/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/09/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/09/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/09/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.