USA v. Johnson et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2012-cr-00024 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
860
05/24/2018
Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release
861
10/04/2018
Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release
862
10/10/2018
Response in Opposition
864
10/29/2018
USPO Expiration of Supervision - 34
865
10/29/2018
Order
11/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
867
11/09/2018
Notice (Other)
868
11/15/2018
Notice (Other)
11/28/2018
Motion Hearing - Material Witness (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
870
11/28/2018
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.