USA v. Johnson et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2012-cr-00024-48318 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
877
03/07/2019
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
878
03/07/2019
Order of Detention
03/07/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/07/2019
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/07/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
879
03/11/2019
Warrant Returned Executed
03/19/2019
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
881
03/26/2019
Continue
03/26/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
883
04/23/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
884
04/23/2019
Continue
885
04/24/2019
Order on Motion to Continue
886
04/24/2019
Withdraw as Attorney
887
04/25/2019
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.