USA v. Johnson et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00156 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
50
06/04/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
51
06/06/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
06/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
06/07/2018
Information - Felony
54
06/07/2018
Plea Agreement
55
06/07/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
06/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
06/07/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
59
06/13/2018
Waiver of Indictment
06/13/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/13/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/13/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
06/25/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
65
06/26/2018
Forfeiture of Property
66
06/28/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
06/29/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/29/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
67
06/28/2018
Unopposed Motion
69
07/09/2018
Continue
07/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
71
07/10/2018
Continue
07/10/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
74
07/17/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
75
07/31/2018
Continue
76
07/31/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions
77
08/02/2018
Continue
78
08/02/2018
Unopposed Motion
08/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/06/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/06/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
81
09/04/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
82
09/13/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
83
09/19/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
09/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
85
09/24/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
86
09/24/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
87
09/24/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
09/27/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
88
09/24/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
89
09/24/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
92
10/02/2018
Continue
10/02/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
94
10/03/2018
Judgment
95
10/03/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
96
10/05/2018
Supplement
97
10/12/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
98
10/12/2018
Notice (Other)
10/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
101
10/20/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
102
10/20/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
103
10/22/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
10/22/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
105
10/23/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
106
10/23/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
107
10/23/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
108
10/23/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
109
10/24/2018
Errata
110
10/24/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
111
10/24/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
10/24/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
112
10/24/2018
Continue
113
10/24/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
118
11/02/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
119
11/13/2018
Order
120
11/15/2018
Judgment
121
11/15/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
122
11/21/2018
Continue
123
11/26/2018
Response in Opposition
11/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.