USA v. Karjala et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00063 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
135
06/11/2018
Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - Bail Review Hearing
136
06/11/2018
Hearing
138
06/12/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
06/12/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
140
06/12/2018
Order on Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - Bail Review Hearing
141
06/15/2018
Response in Opposition
142
06/18/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
06/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
144
06/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
145
06/18/2018
Order
146
06/19/2018
Exhibit List
147
06/19/2018
Summons Returned Executed
06/20/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
150
06/21/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
151
06/21/2018
Indictment - For Public
06/22/2018
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
157
06/26/2018
Notice (Other)
06/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
159
06/27/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
160
06/27/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
06/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
164
06/28/2018
Order of Detention
165
06/29/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
166
06/29/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
167
06/29/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
07/03/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
169
07/03/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
07/05/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
172
07/23/2018
Suppress
175
07/27/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
176
07/27/2018
Response in Opposition
177
07/30/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
178
07/30/2018
Joinder
179
08/02/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
180
08/02/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
181
08/07/2018
Protective Order
182
08/08/2018
Order on Motion for Protective Order
183
08/09/2018
Protective Order
184
08/09/2018
Protective Order
08/09/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
188
08/10/2018
Order on Motion for Protective Order
189
08/10/2018
Order on Motion for Protective Order
08/22/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
193
08/28/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
194
08/29/2018
File Excess Pages
195
08/29/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
196
08/29/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
197
08/30/2018
Response in Opposition
08/31/2018
Notice Re: Chamber Copy (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Notice Re: Chamber Copy (Text entry; no document attached.)
200
08/31/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
09/05/2018
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
204
09/11/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
205
09/14/2018
Notice (Other)
206
09/21/2018
Indictment - For Public
09/21/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
211
09/24/2018
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
10/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
214
10/02/2018
Order
10/02/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
216
11/13/2018
Order
11/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
221
12/04/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
222
12/11/2018
Response in Opposition

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.