USA v. Karjala
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00072-60249 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/21/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
06/21/2018
Indictment - For Public
06/25/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
06/27/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
5
06/27/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
6
06/27/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
7
06/27/2018
Pretrial Services Report
06/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
06/28/2018
Notice of Setting Trial By Jury
06/28/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
06/28/2018
Continue
13
06/28/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
14
06/28/2018
Order of Detention
15
06/29/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
07/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
07/16/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
07/18/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
07/26/2018
Notice (Other)
22
07/26/2018
Order
23
07/30/2018
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
24
08/02/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
25
08/02/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
08/09/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
08/24/2018
Suppress
30
08/24/2018
Memorandum
31
08/24/2018
Suppress
32
08/24/2018
Memorandum
33
08/27/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
08/27/2018
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
09/11/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
36
09/14/2018
Response in Opposition
37
09/14/2018
Response in Opposition
38
09/15/2018
Response in Opposition
39
09/15/2018
Errata
40
09/17/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
09/20/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
09/21/2018
Notice (Other)
09/21/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
09/24/2018
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
46
09/24/2018
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
09/26/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
10/02/2018
Order
10/02/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
12/04/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
55
12/11/2018
Response in Opposition
01/03/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/03/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
01/09/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
01/09/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
01/10/2019
Supplement
60
01/10/2019
Notice (Other)
01/10/2019
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/15/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/15/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/15/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
01/30/2019
Notice of Change of Address
65
02/07/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
02/08/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
67
02/09/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
02/11/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
70
03/04/2019
Unopposed Motion
03/05/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/05/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
72
03/07/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
03/07/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
75
03/12/2019
Notice (Other)
76
03/18/2019
Order on Motion to Suppress
03/27/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/27/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/11/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
79
04/12/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.