USA v. Kaufman
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00174 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
43
05/22/2018
Plea Agreement
44
05/22/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
05/23/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/25/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
07/02/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
48
07/23/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
07/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
07/31/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
51
07/31/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
52
08/01/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
53
08/01/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
08/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.