USA v. Keehn
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00004 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
128
08/26/2018
Appeal Transcript (USDCA 435) Request
129
09/04/2018
Transcript
130
09/12/2018
Unseal Document
131
10/22/2018
USCA Order
10/26/2018
Order on Motion to Unseal Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
133
10/27/2018
Appeal Transcript (USDCA 435) Request
134
11/06/2018
USCA Order
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.