USA v. Kirst
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00180-58890 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
24
10/05/2018
DEPS Notice
25
10/26/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
26
10/29/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
27
11/12/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
28
11/13/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
29
12/11/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
30
12/11/2018
Unopposed Motion
31
12/12/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
32
12/12/2018
Order
33
12/13/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
12/13/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
01/31/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
38
01/31/2019
Declaration
39
02/06/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
40
02/27/2019
Unopposed Motion
41
02/28/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion
42
03/01/2019
Notice of Change of Address
43
03/01/2019
Notice of Change of Address
44
04/08/2019
Unopposed Motion
04/09/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/09/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
04/11/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
47
04/11/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
49
04/12/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
50
04/12/2019
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
51
04/15/2019
Unopposed Motion
52
04/15/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion
53
04/16/2019
Response in Opposition
04/18/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/18/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/18/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/25/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
Scheduling Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.