USA v. Koen Sr
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00144 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
28
07/17/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
29
07/19/2018
Continue
07/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
08/09/2018
Continue
08/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
08/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
35
08/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
36
08/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
37
08/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
08/17/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
08/29/2018
Judgment
41
08/29/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
42
08/29/2018
Amended Judgment
43
08/29/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
09/11/2018
Judgment (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
09/11/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
47
10/19/2018
Status Report
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.