USA v. Kudryn
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00056-60051 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
4
05/18/2018
Pretrial Services Report
05/21/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
05/21/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
7
05/21/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
8
05/21/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
9
05/21/2018
Order of Release
10
05/22/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
11
05/22/2018
Return of Property/PreTrial
12
05/22/2018
Affidavit
13
05/23/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
05/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
05/23/2018
Errata
16
05/23/2018
Response in Opposition
05/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/25/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/25/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
05/25/2018
Passport Surrendered
05/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
05/30/2018
Bail Review Hearing
22
05/30/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
23
05/30/2018
Appearance Bond
24
06/01/2018
Continue
25
06/04/2018
Return of Property/PreTrial
26
06/04/2018
Affidavit
27
06/04/2018
Travel
28
06/04/2018
Affidavit
06/05/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
06/06/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
32
06/06/2018
Passport Surrendered
33
06/06/2018
Passport Surrendered
34
06/06/2018
Passport Surrendered
35
06/06/2018
Passport Surrendered
36
06/06/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
37
06/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
06/06/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
06/06/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
40
06/06/2018
Witness List Public Doc
41
06/06/2018
Exhibit List
06/07/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
06/07/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
06/07/2018
Order Setting Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
06/14/2018
Order on Motion to Continue
46
06/20/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions
47
06/29/2018
Passport Released
48
06/29/2018
Passport Released
49
06/29/2018
Passport Released
50
06/29/2018
Passport Released
51
07/03/2018
Continue
52
07/03/2018
Affidavit
07/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
07/14/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
07/16/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
08/02/2018
Continue
58
08/02/2018
Affidavit
59
08/02/2018
Stipulation
08/02/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
08/10/2018
Order on Stipulation
62
08/14/2018
Continue
63
08/14/2018
Affidavit
08/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
65
08/23/2018
Plea Agreement
08/23/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
66
08/23/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
69
08/24/2018
Forfeiture of Property
70
08/24/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
71
08/29/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions
72
09/04/2018
Passport Released
09/20/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
74
10/01/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
75
10/13/2018
Continue
10/15/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
77
10/17/2018
Modify Conditions of Release
78
10/17/2018
Affidavit
10/18/2018
Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release (Text entry; no document attached.)
80
12/06/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
81
12/13/2018
Continue
12/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
83
02/01/2019
Continue
02/05/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
85
04/08/2019
Continue
04/12/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
88
04/12/2019
Notice (Other)
04/15/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/15/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/15/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/15/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
90
05/16/2019
Transcript

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.