USA v. Lack
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00137 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
36
05/21/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
05/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
05/22/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
05/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
06/04/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
41
06/11/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
42
06/11/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
43
06/11/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
06/11/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
06/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
46
06/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
06/18/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
06/25/2018
Judgment
50
06/25/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
51
12/10/2018
Forfeiture of Property
52
12/10/2018
Affidavit

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.