USA v. Lambert
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00107 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
57
09/14/2018
Unopposed Motion
09/17/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
09/19/2018
Notice (Other)
10/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
10/04/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
62
11/06/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
63
11/13/2018
Unopposed Motion
11/15/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.