USA v. Lambert
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00107-56287 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
57
09/14/2018
Unopposed Motion
09/17/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
09/19/2018
Notice (Other)
10/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
10/04/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
62
11/06/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
63
11/13/2018
Unopposed Motion
11/15/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
65
12/04/2018
Unopposed Motion
12/06/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
68
02/06/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
69
02/06/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
70
02/06/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
71
02/06/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
72
02/12/2019
Notice (Other)
02/19/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
75
02/19/2019
Order of Release
76
02/25/2019
Judgment
77
02/25/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.