USA v. Lamebull
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00141-61010 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/15/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
11/15/2018
Indictment - For Public
11/16/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
11/20/2018
Pretrial Services Report
11/20/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
11/20/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
8
11/20/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
9
11/20/2018
Order of Detention
10
11/21/2018
Third Party Custodian Report
11
11/27/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings
12
11/27/2018
Third Party Custodian Report
11/28/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
11/28/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
15
12/14/2018
Unopposed Motion
16
12/14/2018
Unopposed Motion
12/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
12/18/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
12/19/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
12/28/2018
Suppress
21
12/28/2018
Suppress
22
01/03/2019
Hearing
01/03/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/03/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/03/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
01/04/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
25
01/04/2019
Response in Opposition
01/07/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
01/04/2019
Response in Opposition
28
01/09/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
01/10/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
01/10/2019
Notice (Other)
31
01/10/2019
Notice (Other)
01/10/2019
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
01/22/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release
34
01/22/2019
Order of Release
35
01/28/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
01/28/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/28/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/28/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
01/28/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
39
02/06/2019
Petition for Action - PS8 (DJ) - Request for Modification
40
02/07/2019
Order
02/07/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/07/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
02/12/2019
Subsequent Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - WOA
43
02/13/2019
Order on Petition for Warrant for Offender - 12C
45
02/13/2019
Plea Agreement
46
02/13/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
02/13/2019
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/13/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/13/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/13/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/13/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/13/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/13/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
02/19/2019
Warrant Returned Executed
02/20/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
02/20/2019
Order of Detention
52
02/25/2019
Forfeiture of Property
53
02/25/2019
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
54
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
55
03/19/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
56
04/01/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
57
04/10/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
58
04/16/2019
Continue
59
04/16/2019
Order on Motion to Continue

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.