USA v. Lane
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00003 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
84
09/04/2018
Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
87
09/13/2018
Summons Returned Executed
09/25/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
91
10/01/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
92
10/01/2018
Notice (Other)
93
10/01/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
10/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
96
11/13/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.