USA v. Lane
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00003-54804 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
84
09/04/2018
Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
87
09/13/2018
Summons Returned Executed
09/25/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
91
10/01/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
92
10/01/2018
Notice (Other)
93
10/01/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
10/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
96
11/13/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
11/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/15/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/15/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/17/2019
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
105
02/05/2019
Subsequent Petition for Offender - 12C
106
02/06/2019
Order
02/11/2019
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/11/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/11/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
108
02/11/2019
Order of Detention
02/14/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
110
02/15/2019
Unopposed Motion
02/19/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
112
03/01/2019
Notice of Change of Address
113
03/12/2019
Hearing
114
03/12/2019
Order on Motion for Hearing
03/13/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/13/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
116
03/13/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release
117
03/13/2019
Order of Release
120
03/25/2019
Unopposed Motion
03/26/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/26/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/26/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/26/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
122
04/24/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
05/07/2019
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/07/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/08/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/08/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
125
05/08/2019
Order of Detention
126
05/09/2019
Violation Disposition Report
05/23/2019
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
128
05/24/2019
Judgment on Revocation
129
05/24/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.