USA v. Lang et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cr-00001-52930 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
123
03/25/2019
Order on Petition for Warrant for Offender - 12C
03/25/2019
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/25/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/26/2019
Telephonic Notice of Appointed Counsel (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/27/2019
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/27/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/27/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
128
03/27/2019
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
129
03/27/2019
Notice (Other)
130
03/27/2019
Order of Detention
04/05/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/05/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/08/2019
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
133
04/25/2019
Hearing
04/25/2019
Docket Annotation re Notice re Shortened Time Filing (Text entry; no document attached.)
134
04/25/2019
Hearing
135
04/25/2019
Expedite
136
04/25/2019
Declaration
04/25/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/25/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/26/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/26/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/26/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
139
04/26/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release
140
04/26/2019
Order of Release

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.