USA v. Lantz
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00011-59099 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
32
06/04/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
33
06/25/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
06/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
07/02/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
36
07/02/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
37
07/05/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
38
07/05/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
39
07/05/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
07/06/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
07/05/2018
Unopposed Motion
43
08/10/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
44
08/13/2018
Unopposed Motion
45
08/15/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion
11/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
11/26/2018
Continue
11/27/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
12/17/2018
Notice (Other)
50
12/18/2018
Notice (Other)
51
12/19/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
12/20/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
01/09/2019
Judgment
54
01/09/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
02/06/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/06/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
02/06/2019
Amended Judgment
57
02/06/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.