USA v. Lau
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2014-cr-00001-50635 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
71
04/17/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
04/17/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/17/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
72
04/17/2019
Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release
73
04/17/2019
Affidavit
75
04/18/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
76
04/29/2019
Response in Opposition
05/01/2019
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
77
04/29/2019
Hearing

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.