USA v. Leafstedt
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cr-00047 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
41
05/29/2018
Seal Case
42
06/05/2018
Additional Related Document
43
06/18/2018
Order on Motion to Seal Case
44
06/29/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
45
06/29/2018
Notice (Other)
46
07/12/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
47
07/12/2018
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.