USA v. Leavitt
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00105-60766 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
9
09/19/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
10
09/19/2018
Indictment - For Public
09/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
09/19/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
13
09/24/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
09/28/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
09/28/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
16
10/23/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
17
10/31/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
11/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
11/07/2018
Plea Agreement
20
11/07/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
11/14/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
01/09/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
24
01/18/2019
Withdraw as Attorney
25
01/18/2019
Declaration
01/24/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/30/2019
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
02/13/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
02/19/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/18/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/18/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/18/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
04/01/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
04/03/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
04/03/2019
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.