USA v. Lee et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2013-cr-00049 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
113
06/19/2018
Notice (Other)
114
06/20/2018
Memorandum
115
06/22/2018
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
06/25/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
117
06/25/2018
Transcript
118
07/03/2018
Memorandum
07/06/2018
Evidentiary Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
120
07/06/2018
Witness List Public Doc
121
07/06/2018
Exhibit List
122
08/10/2018
Status Report
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.