USA v. Lee
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2007-cr-00075 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
112
06/08/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
06/08/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/13/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
114
06/13/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
115
06/13/2018
Order of Release
116
06/13/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
117
07/03/2018
Hearing
07/05/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
119
07/05/2018
Report and Recommendation - Initial (Final R&R to follow)
07/06/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
121
07/06/2018
Order
07/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
124
07/13/2018
Judgment on Revocation
125
07/13/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.