USA v. Lee
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2014-cr-00007-50152 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
54
06/29/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed
03/18/2019
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
03/27/2019
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
58
03/28/2019
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
03/28/2019
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/28/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/28/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2019
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
04/01/2019
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
62
04/01/2019
Notice (Other)
63
04/01/2019
Order of Detention
04/01/2019
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
65
04/01/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
04/08/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/08/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/08/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
67
04/08/2019
Order of Detention
04/29/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/29/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/29/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/14/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/14/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.