USA v. Leonard et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00011 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
17
08/23/2018
Unseal Case
18
08/23/2018
Order on Motion to Unseal Case
08/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
08/24/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
08/24/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
08/24/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
25
08/24/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
26
08/24/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
27
08/24/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
08/27/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
08/27/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
08/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
08/30/2018
Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received
32
09/28/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
10/02/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
10/10/2018
Plea Agreement
36
10/10/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
10/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/12/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
10/18/2018
Unopposed Motion
10/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.