USA v. Leonard et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00011-60584 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
77
02/22/2019
Status Report
81
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
83
04/01/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
04/09/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/09/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
89
05/15/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
90
05/15/2019
Expedite
91
05/15/2019
Declaration
05/16/2019
Order on Motion to Expedite (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
94
05/20/2019
Plea Agreement
95
05/20/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.