USA v. Leonard et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00011-60585 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
66
01/21/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
72
02/12/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
73
02/13/2019
Continue
02/14/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/25/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.