USA v. Leonard et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00011-60586 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
17
08/23/2018
Unseal Case
18
08/23/2018
Order on Motion to Unseal Case
08/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
08/24/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
08/24/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
08/24/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
25
08/24/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
26
08/24/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
27
08/24/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
08/27/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
08/27/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
08/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
08/30/2018
Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received
32
09/28/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
10/02/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
10/10/2018
Plea Agreement
36
10/10/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
10/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/12/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
10/18/2018
Unopposed Motion
10/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
12/07/2018
Status Report
12/10/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
12/10/2018
Pretrial Services Report
12/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
12/11/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
54
12/11/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
55
12/11/2018
Order of Detention
56
12/12/2018
Notice of Setting Trial By Jury
12/13/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
12/17/2018
Forfeiture of Property
61
12/18/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
62
12/28/2018
Unopposed Motion
63
12/31/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
01/02/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
67
01/28/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
68
01/28/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
69
01/29/2019
Plea Agreement
70
01/29/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
02/08/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/08/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
82
03/08/2019
Forfeiture of Property
84
04/03/2019
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
88
05/09/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.