USA v. Lepou et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00009-59075 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
82
07/17/2018
Unopposed Motion
83
07/18/2018
Continue
07/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
86
08/17/2018
Plea Agreement
87
08/17/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
88
08/17/2018
Hearing
89
08/23/2018
Hearing
08/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
91
08/24/2018
Plea Agreement
92
08/24/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
08/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
93
08/24/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
97
09/04/2018
Notice (Other)
98
09/04/2018
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
100
09/14/2018
Plea Agreement
101
09/14/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
09/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
105
09/17/2018
Appoint Counsel
106
09/17/2018
Declaration
107
09/18/2018
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
09/19/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
110
09/19/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
111
09/19/2018
Notice (Other)
09/24/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
115
09/26/2018
Passport Released
09/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
120
10/04/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
121
10/15/2018
Notice (Other)
122
10/17/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
10/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
124
10/19/2018
Plea Agreement
125
10/19/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
10/23/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
128
11/02/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
11/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
130
11/28/2018
Plea Agreement
131
11/28/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
11/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
134
12/04/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
12/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
139
12/19/2018
Unopposed Motion
12/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/20/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
141
01/17/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
01/18/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/11/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/11/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/11/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
156
03/01/2019
Notice of Change of Address
157
03/28/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
158
04/04/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
159
04/04/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
160
04/05/2019
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
04/09/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/09/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/09/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/09/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
161
04/05/2019
Continue
164
04/18/2019
Unopposed Motion
04/18/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
166
04/25/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
167
04/25/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
168
04/26/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
169
04/30/2019
Notice (Other)
05/02/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/02/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/02/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
172
05/13/2019
Judgment
173
05/13/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.