USA v. Levu
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00138 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
59
05/31/2018
Notice (Other)
05/31/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
05/31/2018
Unopposed Motion
65
07/19/2018
Plea Agreement
66
07/19/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
67
07/20/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
08/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
69
09/04/2018
Unopposed Motion
09/18/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
72
09/18/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
09/20/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
75
11/07/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
76
12/04/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
12/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.