USA v. Lewis-Daniel et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00016 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
05/21/2018
Clerks Notice - Case Reassigned -JDR Retired (Text entry; no document attached.)
174
05/21/2018
Order on Petition for Warrant for Offender - 12C
05/22/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/25/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/25/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
179
05/25/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
180
05/25/2018
Order of Detention
181
06/05/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
06/08/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
184
07/09/2018
Violation Disposition Report
186
07/11/2018
Notice (Other)
07/16/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
189
07/18/2018
Judgment on Revocation
190
07/18/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf
191
09/05/2018
Amend/Correct
09/19/2018
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
194
09/21/2018
Amended Judgment
195
09/26/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
09/28/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.