USA v. Lewis
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2001-cr-00149 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
357
06/13/2018
Vacate (2255)
06/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
360
06/28/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
361
06/28/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
06/28/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
362
06/28/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
07/03/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
364
07/03/2018
Amended Judgment on Revocation
365
07/03/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.