USA v. Lomu
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00157 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
33
06/06/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
34
06/27/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
35
07/03/2018
Unopposed Motion
07/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
08/10/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
38
08/10/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
39
08/10/2018
Notice (Other)
40
08/10/2018
Errata
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.