USA v. Lomu
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00157-58699 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
33
06/06/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
34
06/27/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
35
07/03/2018
Unopposed Motion
07/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
08/10/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
38
08/10/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
39
08/10/2018
Notice (Other)
40
08/10/2018
Errata
41
10/09/2018
Unopposed Motion
10/10/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
12/04/2018
Continue
12/06/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
01/07/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
01/24/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
01/31/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
48
02/07/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
49
02/07/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
02/19/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
02/19/2019
Order of Release
53
02/20/2019
Notice (Other)
54
02/25/2019
Judgment
55
02/25/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
56
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.