USA v. Long
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2017-cr-00005-57684 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
50
06/15/2018
Report and Recommendation-Initial (Final R&R to follow)-Sealed PDF
07/06/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
08/16/2018
Compel
08/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/17/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
08/17/2018
Response in Opposition
08/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
Docket Annotation re Supplemental Briefing (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
08/24/2018
Supplement
09/11/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
63
09/18/2018
Unopposed Motion
09/19/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
67
10/02/2018
Order
69
10/16/2018
Reconsideration
70
10/22/2018
Unopposed Motion
10/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
73
10/22/2018
Response in Support
10/25/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
75
10/26/2018
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
76
11/06/2018
Status Report
11/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
82
11/13/2018
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
11/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
86
01/02/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
01/02/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/03/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/03/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
89
01/07/2019
Appear
01/07/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
92
01/07/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release
93
01/07/2019
Order of Release
94
01/08/2019
Order
01/08/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/08/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/08/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/09/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/09/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/14/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/17/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
95
01/08/2019
Unopposed Motion
96
01/08/2019
Unopposed Motion
102
01/18/2019
Unopposed Motion

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.