USA v. Lopez et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2011-cr-00080 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
153
06/04/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
154
06/25/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
06/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
156
07/02/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
157
07/02/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
158
07/02/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
159
07/02/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
07/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
164
07/17/2018
Judgment
165
07/17/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
167
07/23/2018
Forfeiture of Property
168
07/23/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
169
09/12/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
170
09/12/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.